Risk Management Committee
Mr. Piroj Samutthananont
Director / Managing Director / Risk Management Committee
AGE: 58 year
DATE OF APPOINTMENT:
- 1 May 2021
EDUCATION / TRAINING
- Master of Business Administration (Business Administration), Queen's University, Canada
- Bachelor of Engineering (Mechanical Engineering), Chulalongkorn University
DIRECTOR TRAINING
- Director Certification Program (DCP) Class 73/2006, Thai Institute of Directors Association (IOD)
BOARD MEMBER / MANAGEMENT IN LISTED COMPANY - THE STOCK EXCHANGE OF THAILAND : 2
- Director / Director to Risk Management Committee/ Managing Director, Global Green Chemicals Public Company Limited
- Senior Vice President, Reporting to Downstream Petrochemical Business, PTT Global Chemical Public Company Limited
BOARD MEMBER / MANAGEMENT IN NON-LISTED COMPANY - THE STOCK EXCHANGE OF THAILAND : 3
- Chairman, GGC Biochemicals Company Limited
- Director, GGC KTIS Bio Industrial Company Limited
- Director, Thai Ethoxylate Company Limited
POSITIONS IN OTHER COMPANY / ORGANIZATION / INSITTUTION / REMARKABLE POSITIONS : NONE
Work experiences
-
16 March - 30 April 2564
Senior Vice President, Downstream Petrochemical Business, PTT Global Chemical Public Company Limited, secondment in Global Green Chemicals Public Company Limited
-
1 January 2020 - 15 March 2021
Senior Vice President, Center of Excellence, PTT Global Chemical Public Company Limited
-
1 January 2020 - 15 March 2021
Director and Managing Director, GC Maintenance and Engineering Company Limited
-
1 September - 31 December 2019
Senior Vice President, Center of Excellence, PTT Global Chemical Public Company Limited
-
1 July - 31 August 2019
Senior Vice President, Procurement, PTT Global Chemical Public Company Limited
-
1 July 2017 - 30 June 2019
Head of Procurement, PTT Global Chemical Public Company Limited
-
1 January 2014 - 30 June 2017
Vice President, Supply Chain Global Solution, PTT Exploration and Production Public Company Limited
SHAREHOLDING
- NONE
FAMILY RELATINSHIP WITH OTHER DIRECTORS, EXECUTIVES, MAJOR SHAREHOLDERS OF GGC OR ITS SUBSIDIARIES
- NONE